THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:46:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-4710
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2451 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7X7
Phone: 613-668-0360
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nowodworski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nowodworski (CPSO#: 89043 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-4710

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, POLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-4710
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2451 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7X7
Phone: 613-668-0360
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nowodworski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nowodworski (CPSO#: 89043 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-4710

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOROTA JOANNA NOWODWORSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWODWORSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOROTA JOANNA NOWODWORSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWODWORSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008