THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:20:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: Khoshnood, Narges (Used Until: 10 Oct 2019)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 903-628 Fleet Street
#903
Toronto Ontario M5V 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164606561
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Narges Hashemi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hashemi (CPSO#: 89053 )
Business Address: PO Box 40012 Rpo Queens Quay
Toronto ON M5V 0A4

General Information

Former Name: Khoshnood, Narges (Used Until: 10 Oct 2019)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 903-628 Fleet Street
#903
Toronto Ontario M5V 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164606561
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Narges Hashemi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hashemi (CPSO#: 89053 )
Business Address: PO Box 40012 Rpo Queens Quay
Toronto ON M5V 0A4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARGES HASHEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASHEMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARGES HASHEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASHEMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008