THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 02:42:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dundas East Medical Clinic
600 Dundas Street East
Suite 4
Belleville Ontario K8N 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-779-8869
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Refined MedSpa
283 Philburn Rd.
Belleville Ontario K8N 4Z5
Phone: 613-966-8116
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ciara Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brown (CPSO#: 89059 )
Business Address: 283 Philburn Road
Belleville Ontario K8N 4Z5
(613) 966-8116
Business Address: Suite 4
600 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5P9
(613) 779-8869

Corporation Name: Mitchell Spencer Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brown (CPSO#: 87599 ) Dr. C. Brown (CPSO#: 89059 )
Business Address: Belleville General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400 Extn: 244

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dundas East Medical Clinic
600 Dundas Street East
Suite 4
Belleville Ontario K8N 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-779-8869
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Refined MedSpa
283 Philburn Rd.
Belleville Ontario K8N 4Z5
Phone: 613-966-8116
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ciara Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brown (CPSO#: 89059 )
Business Address: 283 Philburn Road
Belleville Ontario K8N 4Z5
(613) 966-8116
Business Address: Suite 4
600 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5P9
(613) 779-8869

Corporation Name: Mitchell Spencer Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brown (CPSO#: 87599 ) Dr. C. Brown (CPSO#: 89059 )
Business Address: Belleville General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400 Extn: 244

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CIARA EITHNE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CIARA EITHNE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008