THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:52:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Maharshi Dayanand University, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-773 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057595613
Fax: 7057597466
Address: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neerja Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sharma (CPSO#: 89065 )
Business Address: 65 Thames Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 1S4
(519) 397-4766
Business Address: 7635 Riverview Line
Chatham ON N7M 5T1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Maharshi Dayanand University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-773 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057595613
Fax: 7057597466
Address: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neerja Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sharma (CPSO#: 89065 )
Business Address: 65 Thames Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 1S4
(519) 397-4766
Business Address: 7635 Riverview Line
Chatham ON N7M 5T1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEERJA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEERJA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Maharshi Dayanand University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008