THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:51:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Osmania University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Durham Regional Cancer Center
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 32802
Fax: (905) 721-6101
Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 740-8326
Fax: (705) 740-8125

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Anjum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Anjum (CPSO#: 89066 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
905-576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Osmania University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Durham Regional Cancer Center
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 32802
Fax: (905) 721-6101
Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 740-8326
Fax: (705) 740-8125

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Anjum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Anjum (CPSO#: 89066 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
905-576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHRAZ ANJUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANJUM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHRAZ ANJUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANJUM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Osmania University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008