THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:18:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
2100 Finch Avenue West
North York Ontario M3N 2Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 739-8700
Fax: (416) 739-8701

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan Banach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Banach (CPSO#: 89071 )
Business Address: Suite 301
2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2Z9
(416) 739-8700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
2100 Finch Avenue West
North York Ontario M3N 2Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 739-8700
Fax: (416) 739-8701

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan Banach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Banach (CPSO#: 89071 )
Business Address: Suite 301
2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2Z9
(416) 739-8700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN LEONARD BANACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANACH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN LEONARD BANACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANACH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008