THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:03:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1662 Upper James St
Hamilton ON L9B 1K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-524-1712
Fax: 905-544-2030
Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St. E.
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 726 Upper James St
GHA Surgical Centre
Hamilton ON L9C 2Z9
Phone: 905-575-5743
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Chuback Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chuback (CPSO#: 89087 )
Business Address: 726 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z9
905 575 5743
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 1-1662 Upper James St
Hamilton ON L9B 1K5
905-524-1712

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1662 Upper James St
Hamilton ON L9B 1K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-524-1712
Fax: 905-544-2030
Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St. E.
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 726 Upper James St
GHA Surgical Centre
Hamilton ON L9C 2Z9
Phone: 905-575-5743
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Chuback Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chuback (CPSO#: 89087 )
Business Address: 726 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z9
905 575 5743
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 1-1662 Upper James St
Hamilton ON L9B 1K5
905-524-1712

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ELIZABETH CHUBACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUBACK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ELIZABETH CHUBACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUBACK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008