THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:41:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 605 Royal York Road
Unit 101
Toronto Ontario M8Y 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-800-6500
Fax: 416-342-1790
Address: Citrus Medical Centre
2240 Lake Shore Blvd W
Unit 107
Toronto Ontario M8V 0B1
Phone: 416-800-6500
Extension: 2
Fax: 416-342-1790

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hinal Sheth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sheth (CPSO#: 89113 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 605 Royal York Road
Unit 101
Toronto Ontario M8Y 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-800-6500
Fax: 416-342-1790
Address: Citrus Medical Centre
2240 Lake Shore Blvd W
Unit 107
Toronto Ontario M8V 0B1
Phone: 416-800-6500
Extension: 2
Fax: 416-342-1790

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hinal Sheth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sheth (CPSO#: 89113 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HINAL SHETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HINAL SHETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008