THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:46:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF BASRA, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 103
426 Talbot Street
St Thomas Ontario N5P 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 637-8074
Fax: (519) 637-2646

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 24 Dec 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asmaa Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hussain (CPSO#: 89139 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF BASRA, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 103
426 Talbot Street
St Thomas Ontario N5P 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 637-8074
Fax: (519) 637-2646

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 24 Dec 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asmaa Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hussain (CPSO#: 89139 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASMAA SALAH HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASMAA SALAH HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF BASRA, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008