THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:36:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Huron Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
24 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 235-2700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 98 Shipley St.
Clinton, ON
N0M1L0
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
Phone: (519) 482-3440
Fax: 519-482-8762

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kelly (CPSO#: 89172 )
Business Address: 98 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
(519) 482-3447
Business Address: 19 Water Street
St Marys Ontario N4X 1B6
Business Address: South Huron Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
24 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
(519) 235-2700
Business Address: 6 Albert Street
Parry Sound Ontario P2A 3A4
(705) 746-4540

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Huron Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
24 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 235-2700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 98 Shipley St.
Clinton, ON
N0M1L0
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
Phone: (519) 482-3440
Fax: 519-482-8762

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kelly (CPSO#: 89172 )
Business Address: 98 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
(519) 482-3447
Business Address: 19 Water Street
St Marys Ontario N4X 1B6
Business Address: South Huron Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
24 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
(519) 235-2700
Business Address: 6 Albert Street
Parry Sound Ontario P2A 3A4
(705) 746-4540

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY RUTH KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY RUTH KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Dec 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008