THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:44:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2269894001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin J. Latchford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Latchford (CPSO#: 89189 )
Business Address: 835 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Business Address: 800-55 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Kitchener ON N2G 4W1
2269894001

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2269894001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin J. Latchford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Latchford (CPSO#: 89189 )
Business Address: 835 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Business Address: 800-55 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Kitchener ON N2G 4W1
2269894001

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN JASON LATCHFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATCHFORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN JASON LATCHFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATCHFORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008