THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:13:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Tucuman, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 885 Regent Street
Suite 4 - 1A
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-523-7255
Fax: 705-523-7265
Address: Health Sciences North
Department of Cardiology
Centre Tower 3rd Floor
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Extension: 3661
Fax: (705) 523-7081

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Mar 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 15 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Atilio Costa-Vitali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Costa Vitali (CPSO#: 89192 )
Business Address: 865 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
(705) 988-3048
Business Address: Room 3-28B
885 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5M1
(705) 988-3048
Business Address: Health Sciences North
Department of Cardiology
Centre Tower 3rd Floor
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100 Extn: 3661
Business Address: 935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 2C6
(705) 675-4883

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: National University of Tucuman, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 885 Regent Street
Suite 4 - 1A
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-523-7255
Fax: 705-523-7265
Address: Health Sciences North
Department of Cardiology
Centre Tower 3rd Floor
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Extension: 3661
Fax: (705) 523-7081

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Mar 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 15 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Atilio Costa-Vitali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Costa Vitali (CPSO#: 89192 )
Business Address: 865 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
(705) 988-3048
Business Address: Room 3-28B
885 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5M1
(705) 988-3048
Business Address: Health Sciences North
Department of Cardiology
Centre Tower 3rd Floor
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100 Extn: 3661
Business Address: 935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 2C6
(705) 675-4883

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Aug 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 10 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ATILIO EUGENIO COSTA VITALI may practise medicine independently in cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ATILIO EUGENIO COSTA VITALI may practise medicine independently in cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Tucuman, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Aug 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008