THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:49:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-444 Concession St
Hamilton ON L9A 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-577-0667
Fax: 905-577-0259

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jan 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RANJITH K. RATNASINGAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ratnasingam (CPSO#: 89193 )
Business Address: 905-577-0667
Business Address: 905-577-0667

Corporation Name: Ranjith K. Ratnasingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-444 Concession St
Hamilton ON L9A 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-577-0667
Fax: 905-577-0259

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jan 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RANJITH K. RATNASINGAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ratnasingam (CPSO#: 89193 )
Business Address: 905-577-0667
Business Address: 905-577-0667

Corporation Name: Ranjith K. Ratnasingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANJITH KUMAR RATNASINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATNASINGAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANJITH KUMAR RATNASINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATNASINGAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008