THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:58:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2ndfl-5230 Mitch Owens Rd
Manotick ON K4M 0V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 692 2571
Fax: 613 692 0271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cathy Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Williams (CPSO#: 89201 )
Business Address: Manotick Medical Centre
5230 Mitch Owens Road
P.O. Box 580
Manotick Ontario K4M 1B2
(613) 692-2571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2ndfl-5230 Mitch Owens Rd
Manotick ON K4M 0V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 692 2571
Fax: 613 692 0271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cathy Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Williams (CPSO#: 89201 )
Business Address: Manotick Medical Centre
5230 Mitch Owens Road
P.O. Box 580
Manotick Ontario K4M 1B2
(613) 692-2571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHY LEE WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHY LEE WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008