THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:42:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 315
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 967-8730
Fax: (416) 967-8731

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Ravi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ravi (CPSO#: 89218 )
Business Address: Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
Suite 315
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1H1
(416) 967-8730
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 315
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 967-8730
Fax: (416) 967-8731

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Ravi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ravi (CPSO#: 89218 )
Business Address: Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
Suite 315
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1H1
(416) 967-8730
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BHEESHMA RAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BHEESHMA RAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008