THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:35:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 306
15 Gallie Court
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 721-3344
Fax: (705) 721-5522

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 06 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lindsay Crabbe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Crabbe (CPSO#: 89252 )
Business Address: 306-15 Gallie Court
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 721-3344
Business Address: Suite 301
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 721-3344

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 306
15 Gallie Court
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 721-3344
Fax: (705) 721-5522

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 06 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lindsay Crabbe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Crabbe (CPSO#: 89252 )
Business Address: 306-15 Gallie Court
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 721-3344
Business Address: Suite 301
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 721-3344

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDSAY ANNE CRABBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRABBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDSAY ANNE CRABBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRABBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008