THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:02:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pramukhswami Medical College, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Medicine
Room A10 - 207
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 6858500
Extension: 33852
Fax: (519) 663-3449

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 16 May 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Iyer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Iyer (CPSO#: 89266 )
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 33852

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: Pramukhswami Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Medicine
Room A10 - 207
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 6858500
Extension: 33852
Fax: (519) 663-3449

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 16 May 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Iyer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Iyer (CPSO#: 89266 )
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 33852

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 May 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 16 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Hariharan Subramaniam Iyer may practise medicine independently in
nephrology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Hariharan Subramaniam Iyer may practise medicine independently in
nephrology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pramukhswami Medical College, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008