THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:52:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Drive
Department of Psychiatry
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-5028
Fax: (705) 876-5013
Address: 1011 Elgin Street West
Suite 200
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5J4
Phone: 9053779891
Fax: 9053779865
Address: 10 Angeline Street N
2nd Floor
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 3287321
Fax: 7053287318

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajinder Momi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Momi (CPSO#: 89282 )
Business Address: PRHC Hospital Drive Site
Department of Psychiatry
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 876-5028

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Drive
Department of Psychiatry
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-5028
Fax: (705) 876-5013
Address: 1011 Elgin Street West
Suite 200
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5J4
Phone: 9053779891
Fax: 9053779865
Address: 10 Angeline Street N
2nd Floor
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 3287321
Fax: 7053287318

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajinder Momi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Momi (CPSO#: 89282 )
Business Address: PRHC Hospital Drive Site
Department of Psychiatry
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 876-5028

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJINDER SINGH MOMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJINDER SINGH MOMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Nov 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2008