THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:33:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 56 Governors Road
Dundas Ontario L9H5G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056273541
Extension: 2218
Fax: 905628-0825
Address: 100 Westmount Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 5H8
Phone: 5198246000
Extension: 4080
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hugh Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Boyd (CPSO#: 89284 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 56 Governors Road
Dundas Ontario L9H5G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056273541
Extension: 2218
Fax: 905628-0825
Address: 100 Westmount Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 5H8
Phone: 5198246000
Extension: 4080
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hugh Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Boyd (CPSO#: 89284 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUGH FLEXMAN BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUGH FLEXMAN BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008