THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:01:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Jeanne d'Arc Medical Centre
1887 St. Joseph Blvd.
Orléans Ontario K1C 7J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 9037563
Fax: (613)9037564
Address: 550 Terminal Avenue, Unit B22
Ottawa Ontario K1G 0Z3
Phone: (613) 731-4770
Fax: (613) 731-4979

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Samrai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Samrai (CPSO#: 89291 )
Business Address: 550 Terminal Avenue
Suite B22
Ottawa Ontario K1G 0Z3
(613) 731-4770
Business Address: Jeanne D'Arc Medical Centre
1887 Street Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1C 7J2
(613) 903-7563

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Jeanne d'Arc Medical Centre
1887 St. Joseph Blvd.
Orléans Ontario K1C 7J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 9037563
Fax: (613)9037564
Address: 550 Terminal Avenue, Unit B22
Ottawa Ontario K1G 0Z3
Phone: (613) 731-4770
Fax: (613) 731-4979

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Samrai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Samrai (CPSO#: 89291 )
Business Address: 550 Terminal Avenue
Suite B22
Ottawa Ontario K1G 0Z3
(613) 731-4770
Business Address: Jeanne D'Arc Medical Centre
1887 Street Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1C 7J2
(613) 903-7563

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURINDER SINGH SAMRAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMRAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURINDER SINGH SAMRAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMRAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008