THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 16:19:55 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: AbleLiving Services
2080 Trinity Church Road, R.R. #1
Binbrook Ontario L0R 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056924465
Extension: 129
Fax: 9056924622
Address: 574 Upper James St.
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Y6
Phone: 2893962794
Fax: 2893961847

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Tong & A. Moreno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moreno (CPSO#: 89368 ) Dr. J. Tong (CPSO#: 89317 )
Business Address: 574 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Y6
(289) 396-2794
Business Address: 1500 Main St E
Hamilton ON L8K 1E1
Business Address: B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
(855) 884-6638
Business Address: 2080 Trinity Church Rd
Binbrook ON L0R 1C0
(905) 692-4465 Extn: 129

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: AbleLiving Services
2080 Trinity Church Road, R.R. #1
Binbrook Ontario L0R 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056924465
Extension: 129
Fax: 9056924622
Address: 574 Upper James St.
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Y6
Phone: 2893962794
Fax: 2893961847

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Tong & A. Moreno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moreno (CPSO#: 89368 ) Dr. J. Tong (CPSO#: 89317 )
Business Address: 574 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Y6
(289) 396-2794
Business Address: 1500 Main St E
Hamilton ON L8K 1E1
Business Address: B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
(855) 884-6638
Business Address: 2080 Trinity Church Rd
Binbrook ON L0R 1C0
(905) 692-4465 Extn: 129

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
09 Jun 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 09 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon


As from June 9, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jennifer Nihua Tong
in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tong to the College
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Tong has voluntarily ceased to practise emergency medicine, and shall
give a minimum of two (2) months' notice to the College of her intention
to resume practice in this area.




VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon


As from June 9, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jennifer Nihua Tong
in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tong to the College
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Tong has voluntarily ceased to practise emergency medicine, and shall
give a minimum of two (2) months' notice to the College of her intention
to resume practice in this area.




Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008