THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:35:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Prince Edward Family Health Team
Picton Clinic
389 Main St Suite 4
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134763103
Fax: 6134761604

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A Szymanska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Szymanska (CPSO#: 89327 )
Business Address: 389 Main St Suite 4
Picton ON K0K 2T0
613 476 3130

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Prince Edward Family Health Team
Picton Clinic
389 Main St Suite 4
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134763103
Fax: 6134761604

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A Szymanska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Szymanska (CPSO#: 89327 )
Business Address: 389 Main St Suite 4
Picton ON K0K 2T0
613 476 3130

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKSANDRA SZYMANSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZYMANSKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKSANDRA SZYMANSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZYMANSKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008