THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:48:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital, Pediatrics
Unity Health Toronto
61 Queen Street East, 2nd Floor,
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-867-3655
Fax: 416-867-3736

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.S. Minhas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Minhas (CPSO#: 89333 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital, Pediatrics
Unity Health Toronto
61 Queen Street East, 2nd Floor,
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-867-3655
Fax: 416-867-3736

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.S. Minhas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Minhas (CPSO#: 89333 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIPUDAMAN SINGH MINHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINHAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIPUDAMAN SINGH MINHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINHAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008