THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:51:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ellesmere X-Ray Associates
Suite 15B
1815 Ironstone Manor
Pickering Ontario L1W 3W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-831-1800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Extension: 1123
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Extension: 4134
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maneesh Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gupta (CPSO#: 89363 )
Business Address: 15B-1815 Ironstone Manor
Pickering ON L1W 3W9
(905) 831-1800

Corporation Name: Maneesh Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ellesmere X-Ray Associates
Suite 15B
1815 Ironstone Manor
Pickering Ontario L1W 3W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-831-1800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Extension: 1123
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Extension: 4134
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maneesh Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gupta (CPSO#: 89363 )
Business Address: 15B-1815 Ironstone Manor
Pickering ON L1W 3W9
(905) 831-1800

Corporation Name: Maneesh Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANEESH KUMAR GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANEESH KUMAR GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008