THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:03:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Canadian Forces HSC Ottawa
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1G 2Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 945-1428
Fax: (613) 945-1347
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: WDMH
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: 613-774-2420
Extension: 6812
Fax: 613-774-0453

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Montague Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Montague (CPSO#: 89373 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600
Business Address: Canadian Forces HSC Ottawa
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1G 2Y7
(613) 945-1140
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: WDMH
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2422

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Canadian Forces HSC Ottawa
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1G 2Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 945-1428
Fax: (613) 945-1347
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: WDMH
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: 613-774-2420
Extension: 6812
Fax: 613-774-0453

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Montague Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Montague (CPSO#: 89373 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600
Business Address: Canadian Forces HSC Ottawa
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1G 2Y7
(613) 945-1140
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: WDMH
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2422

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MONTAGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTAGUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MONTAGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTAGUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008