THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:53:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120 Weston Road
unit 101
Toronto Ontario M6N 5H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-349-0053
Fax: 647-349-0063
Address: 300-799 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6G 1L8
Phone: 647-349-0053
Fax: 647-349-0063

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Gin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gin (CPSO#: 89374 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120 Weston Road
unit 101
Toronto Ontario M6N 5H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-349-0053
Fax: 647-349-0063
Address: 300-799 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6G 1L8
Phone: 647-349-0053
Fax: 647-349-0063

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Gin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gin (CPSO#: 89374 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER SEI WHUNG GIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER SEI WHUNG GIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008