THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:16:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
610 University Avenue, 700U
Room 7-721
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 5181
Fax: (416) 946-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 01 Jul 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Medical Oncology
Effective: 14 Mar 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 14 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eitan Amir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Amir (CPSO#: 89383 )
Business Address: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
700 University Avenue
Room 7-721
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 946-4501 Extn: 5181

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
610 University Avenue, 700U
Room 7-721
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 5181
Fax: (416) 946-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 01 Jul 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Medical Oncology
Effective: 14 Mar 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 14 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eitan Amir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Amir (CPSO#: 89383 )
Business Address: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
700 University Avenue
Room 7-721
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 946-4501 Extn: 5181

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Aug 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 11 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Eitan Amir may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Amir holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Amir no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Eitan Amir may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Amir holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Amir no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008