THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:33:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institue of Medicine II, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BURMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4784 Peck Road
Totalcare walk in clinic
Suite A
El Monte California 91732
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (626) 205-1555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rex Hu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hu (CPSO#: 89456 )
Business Address: Suite 152
1880 Eglinton Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1L 2L1
(416) 553-5248

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BURMESE
Medical School: Institue of Medicine II, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4784 Peck Road
Totalcare walk in clinic
Suite A
El Monte California 91732
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (626) 205-1555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rex Hu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hu (CPSO#: 89456 )
Business Address: Suite 152
1880 Eglinton Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1L 2L1
(416) 553-5248

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIN AUNG REX HU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIN AUNG REX HU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institue of Medicine II, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008