THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:01:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Volgogradskij Medicinskij Institut, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glengarry Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
20260 Country Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 525-2222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anatoly Ross Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ross (CPSO#: 89462 )
Business Address: 20260 County Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
(613) 525-4584

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Volgogradskij Medicinskij Institut, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glengarry Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
20260 Country Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 525-2222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anatoly Ross Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ross (CPSO#: 89462 )
Business Address: 20260 County Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
(613) 525-4584

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANATOLY DIMITRI ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANATOLY DIMITRI ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jun 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP: 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jun 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP: 

Training

Medical School: Volgogradskij Medicinskij Institut, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008