THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:26:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2830 Keele St
2nd floor
North York ON M3M 3E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-633-6812
Fax: 416-633-6187
Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie
Ontario
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Schecter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Schecter (CPSO#: 89519 )
Business Address: 2830 Keele Street
Keele Medical Place
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M3M 2G8
416-633-6812

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2830 Keele St
2nd floor
North York ON M3M 3E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-633-6812
Fax: 416-633-6187
Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie
Ontario
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Schecter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Schecter (CPSO#: 89519 )
Business Address: 2830 Keele Street
Keele Medical Place
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M3M 2G8
416-633-6812

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIAL MARVIN ISAK SCHECTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHECTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIAL MARVIN ISAK SCHECTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHECTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008