THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 29 Noxon Street
Alexandra Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194851700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Intercommunity Health Centre
659 Dundas Street
London Ontario N5W 2Z1
Phone: (519) 660-0874
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tarek Loubani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Loubani (CPSO#: 89554 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, SPANISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 29 Noxon Street
Alexandra Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194851700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Intercommunity Health Centre
659 Dundas Street
London Ontario N5W 2Z1
Phone: (519) 660-0874
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tarek Loubani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Loubani (CPSO#: 89554 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAREK MAHMOUD LOUBANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUBANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAREK MAHMOUD LOUBANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUBANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 14 Nov 2024
Summary:
Charges

Tarek Loubani was charged with the following offence:

1.  Mischief under $5,000, on or about November 12, 2024, contrary to section 430(4) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge:  November 20, 2024 
Place of Charge:  London, Ontario
London Police Service

 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 14 Nov 2024
Summary:
Charges

Tarek Loubani was charged with the following offence:

1.  Mischief under $5,000, on or about November 12, 2024, contrary to section 430(4) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge:  November 20, 2024 
Place of Charge:  London, Ontario
London Police Service

 

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jul 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2008