THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Minnesota, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Aurora Family Health Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B6L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 285 1894
Fax: (807) 285 2094
Address: First Nations Family Physicians &
Health Services
Po Box 1500
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1C2
Phone: 807 737 5191
Fax: 807 737 7176

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Feb 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 17 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon J. Wesley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wesley (CPSO#: 89615 ) Dr. C. Branch (CPSO#: 96337 )
Business Address: Aurora Family Health Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6L9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Minnesota, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Aurora Family Health Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B6L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 285 1894
Fax: (807) 285 2094
Address: First Nations Family Physicians &
Health Services
Po Box 1500
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1C2
Phone: 807 737 5191
Fax: 807 737 7176

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Feb 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 17 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon J. Wesley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wesley (CPSO#: 89615 ) Dr. C. Branch (CPSO#: 96337 )
Business Address: Aurora Family Health Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6L9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANNON JEAN WESLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANNON JEAN WESLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Minnesota, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Feb 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2008