THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Rfe Gs 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416) 340-4300
Address: Sports Medicine, MI-STREAM Clinic,
Altum Health, KDT, 4th Floor,
Toronto Western Hospital,
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5092
Fax: (416) 603-5406

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Jul 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Firas A.T. Al-Rawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Al-Rawi (CPSO#: 89632 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergeny Medicine
Room RFE GS 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3856
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Suite KDT 401
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5092

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Rfe Gs 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416) 340-4300
Address: Sports Medicine, MI-STREAM Clinic,
Altum Health, KDT, 4th Floor,
Toronto Western Hospital,
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5092
Fax: (416) 603-5406

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Jul 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Firas A.T. Al-Rawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Al-Rawi (CPSO#: 89632 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergeny Medicine
Room RFE GS 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3856
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Suite KDT 401
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5092

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FIRAS ADIL TAWFIQ AL-RAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-RAWI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FIRAS ADIL TAWFIQ AL-RAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-RAWI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 May 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2008