THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:37:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Bronte St S
Treehouse Pediatrics , suite 302
Milton ON L9T 9M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058765056
Fax: 2896702176
Address: 1-4100 Living Arts Dr
Mississauga ON L5B 0C3
Phone: 9052705600
Fax: 9052708830
Address: 2-4100 Living Arts Dr
Living Arts Medical centre
Unit 2

Mississauga ON L5B 0C3
Phone: 905-270-5600
Fax: 905-270-8830
Address: 2-4100 Living Arts Dr
Mississauga ON L5B 0C3
Phone: 905-270-5600
Fax: 905-270-8870
Address: 2-4100 Living Arts Dr
Living Arts Medical Centre
Mississauga ON L5B 0C3
Phone: 905-270-5600
Fax: 905-270-8830

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eltobgy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. ElTobgy (CPSO#: 89645 )
Business Address: 214 Magnolia Cres
Oakville ON L6M 0Z8

Corporation Name: ElTobgy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Bronte St S
Treehouse Pediatrics , suite 302
Milton ON L9T 9M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058765056
Fax: 2896702176
Address: 1-4100 Living Arts Dr
Mississauga ON L5B 0C3
Phone: 9052705600
Fax: 9052708830
Address: 2-4100 Living Arts Dr
Living Arts Medical centre
Unit 2

Mississauga ON L5B 0C3
Phone: 905-270-5600
Fax: 905-270-8830
Address: 2-4100 Living Arts Dr
Mississauga ON L5B 0C3
Phone: 905-270-5600
Fax: 905-270-8870
Address: 2-4100 Living Arts Dr
Living Arts Medical Centre
Mississauga ON L5B 0C3
Phone: 905-270-5600
Fax: 905-270-8830

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eltobgy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. ElTobgy (CPSO#: 89645 )
Business Address: 214 Magnolia Cres
Oakville ON L6M 0Z8

Corporation Name: ElTobgy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMAL ELDIN MOHAMED ASAAD ELTOBGY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELTOBGY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMAL ELDIN MOHAMED ASAAD ELTOBGY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELTOBGY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2008