THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:12:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Extension: 7547
Fax: 4164804674
Address: Malvern Sleep Clinic
1371 Nielsen Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 282-9119
Fax: No Information Available
Address: TSPC, 123 Edward St
Suite 1011
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
Phone: (416)-813-2277
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 303, 1835 Yonge St
Toronto Ontario M4S1X8
Phone: 416-792-9436
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Narayansingh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narayansingh (CPSO#: 89662 )
Business Address: Malvern Sleep Clinic
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
(416) 282-9119
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100
Business Address: Sleep Care Solutions
Suite 303
1835 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1X8
(416) 792-9436
Business Address: Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street
Suite 1011
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Extension: 7547
Fax: 4164804674
Address: Malvern Sleep Clinic
1371 Nielsen Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 282-9119
Fax: No Information Available
Address: TSPC, 123 Edward St
Suite 1011
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
Phone: (416)-813-2277
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 303, 1835 Yonge St
Toronto Ontario M4S1X8
Phone: 416-792-9436
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Narayansingh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narayansingh (CPSO#: 89662 )
Business Address: Malvern Sleep Clinic
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
(416) 282-9119
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100
Business Address: Sleep Care Solutions
Suite 303
1835 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1X8
(416) 792-9436
Business Address: Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street
Suite 1011
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC JEVAN NARAYANSINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYANSINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC JEVAN NARAYANSINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYANSINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2008