THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:34:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Room 2-007G Core Lab
Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5485
Fax: (416) 864-3055

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle Sholzberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sholzberg (CPSO#: 89698 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Room 2-007G Core Lab, Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5389

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Room 2-007G Core Lab
Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5485
Fax: (416) 864-3055

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle Sholzberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sholzberg (CPSO#: 89698 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Room 2-007G Core Lab, Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5389

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE SHOLZBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOLZBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE SHOLZBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOLZBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2008