THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:38:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Department of Medicine
1280 Main Street West
H S C 3V34
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76764
Fax: (905) 526-0594

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 05 Jul 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jul 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 05 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 05 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Smita Halder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Halder (CPSO#: 89699 )
Business Address: McMaster University
Department of Medicine
1280 Main Street West
Room HSC 3V 34
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 76764

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Department of Medicine
1280 Main Street West
H S C 3V34
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76764
Fax: (905) 526-0594

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 05 Jul 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jul 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 05 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 05 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Smita Halder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Halder (CPSO#: 89699 )
Business Address: McMaster University
Department of Medicine
1280 Main Street West
Room HSC 3V 34
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 76764

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Smita Luna Sudeshna Halder may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Gastroenterology, McMaster University, in which Dr.
Halder holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Halder no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Smita Luna Sudeshna Halder may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Gastroenterology, McMaster University, in which Dr.
Halder holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Halder no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2008