THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:13:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 106
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057262994
Fax: 7057261069
Address: 201 Georgian Dr
RVH
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jose O. Lopez Alonso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lopez Alonso (CPSO#: 89730 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 241-6226
Business Address: 301 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 725-0885
Business Address: 106-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
7052416226

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 106
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057262994
Fax: 7057261069
Address: 201 Georgian Dr
RVH
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jose O. Lopez Alonso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lopez Alonso (CPSO#: 89730 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 241-6226
Business Address: 301 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 725-0885
Business Address: 106-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
7052416226

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSE OSCAR LOPEZ ALONSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ ALONSO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSE OSCAR LOPEZ ALONSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ ALONSO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2008