THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:52:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: 9058532222
Address: 21-117 Young St
Alliston ON L9R 0E9
Phone: 7054340074
Fax: 7054349074
Address: 14872 Yonge Street
Aurora Ontario L4G1N2
Phone: 9055050950
Fax: 9058419404
Address: 535 Mulock Dr
suite 300
Newmarket ON L3Y 5H2
Phone: 2893664564
Fax: 2893662065
Address: 300 Rossland Rd E
Oshawa ON L1Z 0M1
Phone: 9052311829
Fax: 9052311849
Address: 4779 Steeles Ave E
Scarborough ON M1V 4S7
Phone: 4162984956
Fax: 4167549543
Address: 3838 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON M1V 5K5
Phone: 9052311829
Fax: 9052311849

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shahzad Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Qureshi (CPSO#: 89731 )
Business Address: 21-117 Yonge Street
Alliston Ontario L9R 0E9
(705) 434-0074
Business Address: 300-535 Mulock Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5H2
(905) 953-9044
Business Address: 14872 Yonge Street
Aurora Ontario L4G 1N2
(905) 505-0950
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: 9058532222
Address: 21-117 Young St
Alliston ON L9R 0E9
Phone: 7054340074
Fax: 7054349074
Address: 14872 Yonge Street
Aurora Ontario L4G1N2
Phone: 9055050950
Fax: 9058419404
Address: 535 Mulock Dr
suite 300
Newmarket ON L3Y 5H2
Phone: 2893664564
Fax: 2893662065
Address: 300 Rossland Rd E
Oshawa ON L1Z 0M1
Phone: 9052311829
Fax: 9052311849
Address: 4779 Steeles Ave E
Scarborough ON M1V 4S7
Phone: 4162984956
Fax: 4167549543
Address: 3838 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON M1V 5K5
Phone: 9052311829
Fax: 9052311849

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shahzad Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Qureshi (CPSO#: 89731 )
Business Address: 21-117 Yonge Street
Alliston Ontario L9R 0E9
(705) 434-0074
Business Address: 300-535 Mulock Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5H2
(905) 953-9044
Business Address: 14872 Yonge Street
Aurora Ontario L4G 1N2
(905) 505-0950
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHZAD QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHZAD QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jun 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jun 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2008