THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 02:52:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stratford General Hospital - DI Dep
46 General Hospital Road
Stratford, ON
N5A 2Y8
London Ontario N5A 2Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-272-8210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Siddharth Chhibber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chhibber (CPSO#: 89738 )
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8210

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stratford General Hospital - DI Dep
46 General Hospital Road
Stratford, ON
N5A 2Y8
London Ontario N5A 2Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-272-8210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Siddharth Chhibber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chhibber (CPSO#: 89738 )
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8210

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIDDHARTH CHHIBBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHHIBBER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIDDHARTH CHHIBBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHHIBBER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2008