THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:49:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Catolica do Parana, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth Street, 11E207
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 5869
Fax: (416) 340-5517

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 15 Aug 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fischer (CPSO#: 89756 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
11E207
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3723

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Catolica do Parana, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth Street, 11E207
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 5869
Fax: (416) 340-5517

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 15 Aug 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fischer (CPSO#: 89756 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
11E207
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3723

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Mar 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 13 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sandra Elisabeth Fischer may practise medicine independently in Anatomic
Pathology, only.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sandra Elisabeth Fischer may practise medicine independently in Anatomic
Pathology, only.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Catolica do Parana, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2008