THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:45:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bramalea & Bovaird Walk-in Clinic
Unit 107
10095 Bramalea Rd
Brampton Ontario L6R 0K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 793-3311
Fax: (905) 793-3631

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Inderpreet Budhiraja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Budhiraja (CPSO#: 89760 )
Business Address: 2120 North Park Drive
Unit 16
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Business Address: Bramalea & Bovaird Walk-In Clinic
10095 Bramalea Road
Unit 107
Brampton Ontario L6R 0K1
(905) 793-3311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bramalea & Bovaird Walk-in Clinic
Unit 107
10095 Bramalea Rd
Brampton Ontario L6R 0K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 793-3311
Fax: (905) 793-3631

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Inderpreet Budhiraja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Budhiraja (CPSO#: 89760 )
Business Address: 2120 North Park Drive
Unit 16
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Business Address: Bramalea & Bovaird Walk-In Clinic
10095 Bramalea Road
Unit 107
Brampton Ontario L6R 0K1
(905) 793-3311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INDERPREET SINGH BUDHIRAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUDHIRAJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INDERPREET SINGH BUDHIRAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUDHIRAJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2008