THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:29:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Danylo Halytsky Lviv State Med Univ, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 402-3101 Bloor St W
Etobicoke ON M8X 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167665888
Fax: 4167665885

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Opyr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Opyr (CPSO#: 89767 )
Business Address: 402-3101 Bloor St W
Etobicoke ON M8X 2W2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Danylo Halytsky Lviv State Med Univ, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 402-3101 Bloor St W
Etobicoke ON M8X 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167665888
Fax: 4167665885

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Opyr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Opyr (CPSO#: 89767 )
Business Address: 402-3101 Bloor St W
Etobicoke ON M8X 2W2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OKSANA LUBOMYRIVNA OPYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OPYR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OKSANA LUBOMYRIVNA OPYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OPYR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Aug 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Aug 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: Danylo Halytsky Lviv State Med Univ, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2008