THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/04/25 23:15:33 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Eglinton Town Centre Health Clinic
Unit 1
127 Lebovic Ave
Scarborough Ontario M1L 4V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 701-0127
Fax: (416) 701-9727

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Muthulingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Muthulingam (CPSO#: 89772 )
Business Address: Eglinton Town Centre Health Clinic
127 Lebovic Avenue
Unit 1
Toronto Ontario M1L 0J2
(416) 701-0127

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Eglinton Town Centre Health Clinic
Unit 1
127 Lebovic Ave
Scarborough Ontario M1L 4V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 701-0127
Fax: (416) 701-9727

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Muthulingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Muthulingam (CPSO#: 89772 )
Business Address: Eglinton Town Centre Health Clinic
127 Lebovic Avenue
Unit 1
Toronto Ontario M1L 0J2
(416) 701-0127

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANTHI MUTHULINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUTHULINGAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANTHI MUTHULINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUTHULINGAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2008