THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:56:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Guyana, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: ONE HEALTH CARE
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 239-7663
Fax: (905) 239-4664

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omawattie Ramraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ramraj (CPSO#: 89785 )
Business Address: One Health Care
Suite 201
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0M1
(905) 239-7663

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Guyana, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: ONE HEALTH CARE
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 239-7663
Fax: (905) 239-4664

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omawattie Ramraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ramraj (CPSO#: 89785 )
Business Address: One Health Care
Suite 201
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0M1
(905) 239-7663

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAWATTIE RAMRAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMRAJ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAWATTIE RAMRAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMRAJ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Guyana, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2008