THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 03:17:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807 684 7200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Faghih Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Faghih (CPSO#: 89788 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-7200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807 684 7200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Faghih Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Faghih (CPSO#: 89788 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-7200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIR HOSSEIN FAGHIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAGHIH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIR HOSSEIN FAGHIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAGHIH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2008