THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 16:09:54 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Extension: 70185
Fax: (613) 247-3511

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Vickers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vickers (CPSO#: 89796 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 761-4999
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
Box 911
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-7700 Extn: 70185

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Extension: 70185
Fax: (613) 247-3511

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Vickers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vickers (CPSO#: 89796 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 761-4999
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
Box 911
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-7700 Extn: 70185

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MACDONALD VICKERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VICKERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MACDONALD VICKERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VICKERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2008