THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:44:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West
Unit 203
London Ontario N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 434 4727
Fax: 519 434 4700
Address: 200 Queens Ave
London ON N6A 1J3
Phone: 5196733242
Fax: 5196731022
Address: 475 Talbot St.
St Thomas Ontario N5P 1C1
Phone: (519) 631-9040
Fax: (519) 631-9355

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jan 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. L. Gracey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gracey (CPSO#: 89802 )
Business Address: 648 Huron Street
2nd Floor
London Ontario N5Y 4J8
(519) 424-9191
Business Address: 475 Talbot Street
St Thomas Ontario N5P 1C1
(519) 631-9040
Business Address: 203-215 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 5A9
(519) 434-4727

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West
Unit 203
London Ontario N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 434 4727
Fax: 519 434 4700
Address: 200 Queens Ave
London ON N6A 1J3
Phone: 5196733242
Fax: 5196731022
Address: 475 Talbot St.
St Thomas Ontario N5P 1C1
Phone: (519) 631-9040
Fax: (519) 631-9355

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jan 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. L. Gracey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gracey (CPSO#: 89802 )
Business Address: 648 Huron Street
2nd Floor
London Ontario N5Y 4J8
(519) 424-9191
Business Address: 475 Talbot Street
St Thomas Ontario N5P 1C1
(519) 631-9040
Business Address: 203-215 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 5A9
(519) 434-4727

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANEL LOUISE GRACEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRACEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANEL LOUISE GRACEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRACEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2008