THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/04/25 23:28:56 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: ST CYRIL AND METHODIUS UNIVERSITY, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7181 Yonge St
Enhanced Care Clinic
Unit 28-29
Thornhill ON L3T 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 Don Mills Rd
Don Mills Medical Clinic
North York ON M3C 1V4
Phone: (416) 383-1251
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jan 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Macedonia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peeva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Peeva (CPSO#: 89857 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6139

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: ST CYRIL AND METHODIUS UNIVERSITY, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7181 Yonge St
Enhanced Care Clinic
Unit 28-29
Thornhill ON L3T 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 Don Mills Rd
Don Mills Medical Clinic
North York ON M3C 1V4
Phone: (416) 383-1251
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jan 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Macedonia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peeva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Peeva (CPSO#: 89857 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6139

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Jan 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 24 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Valentina Kosta Peeva may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Valentina Kosta Peeva may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: ST CYRIL AND METHODIUS UNIVERSITY, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2008