THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 17:38:00 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613)7614169
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yegappan Bennett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bennett (CPSO#: 92741 ) Dr. C. Yegappan (CPSO#: 89864 )

Corporation Name: Yegappan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Mar 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613)7614169
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yegappan Bennett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bennett (CPSO#: 92741 ) Dr. C. Yegappan (CPSO#: 89864 )

Corporation Name: Yegappan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Mar 2014

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIDAMBARAM YEGAPPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEGAPPAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIDAMBARAM YEGAPPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEGAPPAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2008